UT SB0112 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Inland Port Amendments
Title
Inland Port Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-28 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-28 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2020-03-28 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-12 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-11 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2020-03-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-11 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-03-07 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-03-07 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-06 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-06 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Boards and Committees
Business
Commerce and Trade
Economic Development
Environment
Government Operations (State Issues)
Health
Land Use
Municipal Officers
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Ports of Entry
Public Health
Roads/Highways
Transportation
Business
Commerce and Trade
Economic Development
Environment
Government Operations (State Issues)
Health
Land Use
Municipal Officers
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Ports of Entry
Public Health
Roads/Highways
Transportation