UT SB0112 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Voter Registration Revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Registration Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2018-03-08SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2018-02-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-02-28HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2018-02-28HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2018-02-28SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-02-27SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-02-27SenateSenate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-27SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-21SenateSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-21SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-16SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-16SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-16SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-01-31SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-01-31SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2018-01-30SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2018-01-26SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2018-01-25SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-01-25SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-01-24 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-01-24 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback