UT SB0111 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Education Amendments
Title
Higher Education Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Millner [R] | Rep. Brad Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-28 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2020-03-28 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-06 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-06 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-06 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-04 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-03 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-03 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Education Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Education Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-21 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-21 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Colleges and Universities
Education
Governance
Higher Education
State Board of Regents
Technical Colleges
Utech Board of Trustees
Education
Governance
Higher Education
State Board of Regents
Technical Colleges
Utech Board of Trustees