UT SB0110 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Driver License Suspension Amendments
Title
Driver License Suspension Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-02-28 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-25 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-24 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-24 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ received from House in SSEC | |
2011-02-23 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-02-22 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB | |
2011-02-22 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTTRA | |
2011-02-17 | House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA | |
2011-02-16 | House/ received from Senate in HINTRO | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ uncircled in S3RD | |
2011-02-14 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-11 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-02-02 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT | |
2011-01-28 | Senate Comm - Held in SSTTPT | |
2011-01-25 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-25 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |