UT SB0104 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable Energy Modifications
Title
Renewable Energy Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-19 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-19 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-02-18 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-02-18 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-02-17 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTNAE | |
2010-02-11 | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE | |
2010-02-10 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-10 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2010-02-10 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-09 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2010-02-03 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT | |
2010-01-28 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTTPT | |
2010-01-28 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTTPT | |
2010-01-27 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |