UT SB0103 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Military Tax Credit
Title
Military Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Income Tax
Individual Income Tax
Revenue and Taxation
State Tax Commission
Tax Credits
Veterans and Military Affairs
Individual Income Tax
Revenue and Taxation
State Tax Commission
Tax Credits
Veterans and Military Affairs
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/static/SB0103.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/sbillint/SB0103.pdf |