UT SB0102 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Tinted Vehicle Windows Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tinted Vehicle Windows Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2018-03-05SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2018-02-16SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-16SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-05SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-05SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2018-02-02SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2018-02-02SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2018-02-02SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2018-01-25SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2018-01-24SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2018-01-24SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2018-01-24SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2018-01-23SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-01-23SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-01-22 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-01-22 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-01-22 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback