UT SB0100 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Gender Identity Policies
Title
School Gender Identity Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-02-09 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-06 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-06 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-06 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-02-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-02-03 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2023-02-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2023-02-03 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2023-02-03 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-01-30 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-01-30 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-27 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-27 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-24 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-23 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-23 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-20 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-20 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Charter Schools
Education
K-12 Education
School Accountability
School Districts
Student health and safety
Student Privacy
Education
K-12 Education
School Accountability
School Districts
Student health and safety
Student Privacy