UT SB0098 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Prohibition on Using a Handheld Wireless Communication Device While Operating a Vehicle
Title
Amendments to Prohibition on Using a Handheld Wireless Communication Device While Operating a Vehicle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 39 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ amended out amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ amended out amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2012-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-03-15 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-15 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2012-03-07 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-06 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-06 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-06 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2012-03-06 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-03-06 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-03-06 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2012-03-06 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-06 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-05 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-28 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-28 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ amended out amendment in S3RD | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2012-02-27 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2012-02-27 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2012-02-27 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-02-23 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-02-23 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-14 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-13 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-13 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-02-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-07 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |