UT SB0093 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
Pending: House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Agricultural Nuisance Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural Nuisance Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-02-21HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2019-02-21HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2019-02-21SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 3 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-02-21SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-02-19SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-02-19SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-02-15SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-02-15SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-02-05SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-02-05SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-04SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-04SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-01-30SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-01-25 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-01-24 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback