UT SB0093 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child Welfare Legislative Oversight Panel Reporting Amendments
Title
Child Welfare Legislative Oversight Panel Reporting Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-14 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-14 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-02-11 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-11 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2011-02-08 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-07 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-01 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2011-01-31 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-01-28 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-01-28 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTHHS | |
2011-01-27 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTHHS | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |