UT SB0090 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Political Signs Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Signs Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2019-03-14SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2019-03-14SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2019-03-11HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee
2019-03-11HouseHouse Comm - Returned to Rules in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse Comm - Held in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-03-06HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-03-04HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-03-04HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-03-04HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2019-03-04HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2019-03-04SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-03-01SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-03-01SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-02-27SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-02-27SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-27SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-27SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-27SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-02-27SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-01-31SenateSenate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-01-31SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-01-28SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-01-25SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-01-23 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-01-23 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/static/SB0090.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/sbillint/SB0090.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/sbillint/SB0090S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/sbillamd/SB0090S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/SB0090.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/SB0090S01.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=10235
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=10241
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=12100
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=12102
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=12109
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2019GS&voteid=906&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2019GS&voteid=960&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=13021
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=13020

Bill Comments

feedback