UT SB0090 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Securities Fraud Reporting Program Act Amendments
Title
Securities Fraud Reporting Program Act Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Bird [R] | Sen. Ben McAdams [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2012-03-19 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-03-19 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-16 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2012-02-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-13 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-13 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-13 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2012-02-10 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-02-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-02-10 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR | |
2012-02-09 | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL | |
2012-02-09 | Senate/ received from House in SSEC | |
2012-02-08 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-02-08 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-02-08 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2012-02-03 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB | |
2012-02-03 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-02 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-02 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-01 | House Comm - Held in HSTBUS | |
2012-01-31 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2012-01-30 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-01-30 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-01-30 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2012-01-30 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2012-01-30 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S3RD | |
2012-01-27 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2012-01-27 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-01-26 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-01-26 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTBUS | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2012-01-23 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS | |
2012-01-23 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-19 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-01-10 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2011-12-20 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2011-11-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-11-08 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |