UT SB0090 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mental Health Professional Practice Act Amendments
Title
Mental Health Professional Practice Act Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2010-02-02 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTHHS | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2010-01-26 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-25 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2010-01-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |