UT SB0089 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Cannabis-based Medicine Amendments
Title
Cannabis-based Medicine Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-09 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2016-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-22 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-22 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-22 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-01-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |