UT SB0089 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowner Association Reserve Account
Title
Homeowner Association Reserve Account
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Senate/ substituted in SSUB | |
2011-02-17 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2011-02-08 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2011-02-07 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTBUS | |
2011-02-07 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTBUS | |
2011-02-04 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |