UT SB0087 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Marketable Record Title Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marketable Record Title Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-30 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2011-03-17 Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2011-03-17 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2011-03-04 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2011-03-04 Senate/ received from House in SPRES
2011-03-04 House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2011-03-03 Senate/ to House in HSPKR
2011-03-02 Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL
2011-03-02 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-03-02 House/ uncircled in H3RDSB
2011-03-02 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2011-02-24 House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTBUS
2011-02-23 House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTBUS
2011-02-22 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2011-02-18 Senate/ to House in HCLERK
2011-02-18 Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2011-02-17 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2011-02-08 Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTBUS
2011-02-07 Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTBUS
2011-02-07 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTBUS
2011-02-04 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-02-03 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-02-03 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback