UT SB0083 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ to Senate in SSEC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ to Senate in SSEC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bail Bond Recovery Amendments
Title
Bail Bond Recovery Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Greiner [R] | Rep. Curtis Oda [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-17 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-17 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-08 | House Comm - Held in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-01 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2010-01-29 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-01-29 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2010-01-28 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-01-27 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2010-01-25 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-13 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSEC | |
2010-01-13 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSEC | |
2010-01-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |