UT SB0076 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled Substance Database Access
Title
Controlled Substance Database Access
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Weiler [R] | Rep. Paul Ray [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-02 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-02 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-02 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-02-25 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | House Comm - Held in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Attorney General
Business
Constitutional Officers
Controlled Substances
Controlled Substances Database
Department of Health
Fraud
Government Operations (State Issues)
Health
Medicaid
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Business
Constitutional Officers
Controlled Substances
Controlled Substances Database
Department of Health
Fraud
Government Operations (State Issues)
Health
Medicaid
Occupational and Professional Licensing