UT SB0070 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - Senate/ uncircled in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - Senate/ uncircled in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community Development and Renewal Agencies Amendments
Title
Community Development and Renewal Agencies Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis Bramble [R] | Rep. Brad Dee [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-02-18 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTREV | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTREV | |
2011-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTREV | |
2011-02-09 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV | |
2011-02-09 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTWED | |
2011-02-08 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-07 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |