UT SB0064 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' Compensation Health Care Amendments
Title
Workers' Compensation Health Care Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-13 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-08 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in House Speaker |
2018-03-08 | Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-08 | Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-08 | House/ to Senate in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-08 | House Conference Committee - Final Passage in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-08 | House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-08 | Conference Committee Report in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-08 | Bill Substituted by Conference Committee from # 1 to # 2 in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-08 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-07 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-07 | Senate/ to House in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-07 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-07 | Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-07 | House/ to Senate in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-07 | House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2018-03-07 | House | House/ refused to recede from House amendment in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-07 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-07 | House | Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-20 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-20 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-01-02 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |