UT SB0063 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recreational Activities Related to Public Waters
Title
Recreational Activities Related to Public Waters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-03 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-03 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-01-31 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-01-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |