UT SB0063 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

K-3 Reading Improvement Program Accountability

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-3 Reading Improvement Program Accountability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-30 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2011-03-21 Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2011-03-18 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2011-03-09 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2011-03-09 Senate/ received from House in SPRES
2011-03-08 House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2011-03-08 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2011-03-07 House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB
2011-03-03 House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL
2011-02-22 House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU
2011-02-18 House/ received from Senate in HINTRO
2011-02-18 Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2011-02-17 Senate/ circled in S3RD
2011-02-16 Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2011-02-16 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2011-02-08 Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTEDU
2011-02-07 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTEDU
2011-02-07 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU
2011-02-03 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-02-02 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-02-02 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback