UT SB0060 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pilot Accountability Permit Program and Identity Related Amendments
Title
Pilot Accountability Permit Program and Identity Related Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-03 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0060.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/sbillint/sb0060.pdf |