UT SB0051 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bioprospecting
Title
Bioprospecting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB | |
2010-02-12 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-02 | Senate Comm - Held in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-01 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTNAE | |
2010-01-30 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTNAE | |
2010-01-28 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |