UT SB0049 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Purpose of Minimum School Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Purpose of Minimum School Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-09 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2017-03-09SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2017-03-07HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in House Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Comm - Returned to Rules in House Education Committee
2017-02-09HouseHouse Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Education Committee
2017-02-09HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Education Committee
2017-02-01HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Education Committee
2017-01-31HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2017-01-30HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2017-01-30HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2017-01-30HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2017-01-30SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2017-01-27SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2017-01-27SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-01-25SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-01-25SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-01-25SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-01-25SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee
2017-01-24SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee
2017-01-23SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee
2017-01-23SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2017-01-11SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2017-01-07 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-12-20 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-12-20 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-12-20 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback