UT SB0049 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Statute of Limitations on Environmental Code Violations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statute of Limitations on Environmental Code Violations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-29 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2016-03-15 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2016-03-15SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2016-03-15SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2016-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2016-02-29 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-02-24 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-02-24 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-02-24SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2016-02-24SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2016-02-24SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2016-02-24HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2016-02-24HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-02-23HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-02-23HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Judiciary Committee
2016-02-22HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee
2016-02-18HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee
2016-02-17HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2016-02-17 House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2016-02-16 Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2016-02-16 Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2016-02-16SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2016-02-12SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2016-02-12SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-02-12SenateSenate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-02-12SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-02-11SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-02-11SenateSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-02-09SenateLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-02-09SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-02-09SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-01-28SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-01-28SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-01-27SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-01-27SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-01-25SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2016-01-25SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2016-01-08 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2015-12-22 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2015-12-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/static/SB0049.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/sbillint/SB0049.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/sbillamd/SB0049.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/sbillint/SB0049S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/sbillenr/SB0049.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=5188&sequence=3174
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=5188&sequence=11342
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=282&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=295&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=5718&sequence=15600
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=454&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback