UT SB0049 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute Bear Lake Sovereign Lands Amendments
Title
Substitute Bear Lake Sovereign Lands Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-12 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-02 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-02 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-02 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-02 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-01-14 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-01-09 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-01-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-01-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |