UT SB0047 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alzheimer's Disease and Related Dementias Act
Title
Alzheimer's Disease and Related Dementias Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in SSUB | |
2012-02-09 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-06 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-02 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-31 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-30 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0047.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/sbillint/sb0047.pdf |