UT SB0046 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture Sustainability Act
Title
Agriculture Sustainability Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND | |
2012-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTNAE | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE | |
2012-01-31 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE | |
2012-01-30 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-27 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |