UT SB0045 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Wireless Telephone Use Restriction for Minors in Vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wireless Telephone Use Restriction for Minors in Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-08 - House - House/ failed (Y: 32 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE
2011-03-08 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-03-08 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2011-03-07 House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB
2011-03-04 House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL
2011-02-28 House Comm - Not Considered in HSTTRA
2011-02-17 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2011-02-17 Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK
2011-02-17 Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2011-02-16 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2011-02-08 Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTTPT
2011-02-07 Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTTPT
2011-01-31 Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL
2011-01-31 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL
2011-01-26 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-01-25 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-01-25 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback