UT SB0043 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Post-retirement Employment Amendments
Title
Post-retirement Employment Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTRIE | |
2010-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRIE | |
2010-01-25 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTRIE | |
2010-01-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0043.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/sbillint/sb0043.pdf |