UT SB0042 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Notice of Court Recording
Title
Public Notice of Court Recording
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Mayne [D] | Rep. Jon Stanard [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2016-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-24 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-22 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-22 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2016-02-19 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2016-02-19 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2016-02-19 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2016-02-19 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2016-02-17 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2016-02-17 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-08 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-08 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-08 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-01-08 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-12-24 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-12-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-12-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |