UT SB0041 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appointment of County Assessors
Title
Appointment of County Assessors
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Millner [R] | Rep. Jon Stanard [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2016-03-17 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-24 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-18 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-18 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2016-02-17 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2016-02-17 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2016-02-17 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2016-02-17 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2016-02-16 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2016-02-16 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-09 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-09 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-09 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-01-08 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-12-22 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-12-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-12-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |