UT SB0040 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employment Practices and Protection from Violence
Title
Employment Practices and Protection from Violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTBUS | |
2011-01-26 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-25 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0040.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/sbillint/sb0040.pdf |