UT SB0038 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
K-3 Reading Amendments
Title
K-3 Reading Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-21 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-02-10 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-09 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-09 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2011-02-04 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB | |
2011-02-03 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU | |
2011-01-31 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-28 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-01-28 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-01-27 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-01-25 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-20 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO | |
2011-01-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |