UT SB0038 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Restrictions on High Occupancy Vehicle Lane
Title
Restrictions on High Occupancy Vehicle Lane
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-04 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-04 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-03-01 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2010-03-01 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-25 | House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-23 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S3RD | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2010-02-19 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in S2ND | |
2010-02-12 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2010-02-02 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2010-02-02 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2010-01-27 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2010-01-27 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTTPT | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2010-01-25 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |