UT SB0037 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic Cigarette and Other Nicotine Product Amendments
Title
Electronic Cigarette and Other Nicotine Product Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-28 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2020-03-28 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-16 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-12 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ substituted from # 4 to # 6 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-11 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 3 to # 4 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ motion to reconsider in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-02 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ returned to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-01-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Cigarette and Tobacco Taxes
Department of Health
Electronic Cigarettes
Health
Local Health Departments
Revenue and Taxation
Tobacco and Other Nicotine Products
Department of Health
Electronic Cigarettes
Health
Local Health Departments
Revenue and Taxation
Tobacco and Other Nicotine Products