UT SB0037 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Food Agency Amendments
Title
Emergency Food Agency Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-15 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-14 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-02-14 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-14 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2011-02-09 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HCON | |
2011-02-08 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTWED | |
2011-01-31 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-31 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-01-31 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2011-01-25 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTWED | |
2011-01-25 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTWED | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-21 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SINTRO | |
2011-01-20 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-01-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |