UT SB0035 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veteran License Plates Amendments
Title
Veteran License Plates Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Knudson [R] | Rep. Paul Ray [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2016-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-17 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-15 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-11 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2016-02-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2016-02-11 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2016-02-11 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2016-02-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2016-02-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2016-02-10 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Transportation Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-03 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-03 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-03 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-01-29 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-01-08 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-01-08 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-12-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-12-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-12-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |