UT SB0028 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-30 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Dentist Educator License Reauthorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dentist Educator License Reauthorization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-30SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2015-01-30SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2015-01-30SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-01-26SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-01-26SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2015-01-14 Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2015-01-09 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2014-12-16 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2014-12-15 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2014-12-15 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2014-12-11 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback