UT SB0028 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Utah Retirement Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utah Retirement Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-03 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2014-02-20 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2014-02-20SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2014-02-20SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2014-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2014-02-19 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2014-02-19 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-02-19 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-02-19SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2014-02-18SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2014-02-18SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2014-02-18HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR
2014-02-18HouseHouse/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB
2014-02-18HouseHouse/ motion to reconsider in HCLERK
2014-02-16HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2014-02-14HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2014-02-13SenateHouse/ recalled by House in SPRES
2014-02-13 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-02-13SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2014-02-12SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2014-02-12SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2014-02-12HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR
2014-02-12HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2014-02-11HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB
2014-02-11HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in HSTRIE
2014-02-10HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTRIE
2014-02-06HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTRIE
2014-01-31HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-01-31HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2014-01-30HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2014-01-30HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2014-01-30SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2014-01-29SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2014-01-29SenateSenate/ uncircled in S2ND
2014-01-27SenateSenate/ circled in S2ND
2014-01-27SenateSenate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2014-01-27SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2014-01-27SenateSenate/ Rules to calendar in S2ND
2014-01-27SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2014-01-21SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in SINTRO
2013-12-18 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC
2013-12-16 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2013-12-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2013-12-11 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0028.htm
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillint/sb0028.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillamd/sb0028.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillenr/sb0028.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=35&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=36&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=71&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=72&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=74&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2014GS&voteid=3041&sequence=5945
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=172&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=225&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=226&house=H&sessionid=2014GS

Bill Comments 750

feedback