UT SB0028 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amendments to Individual Income Tax Return Filing Requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amendments to Individual Income Tax Return Filing Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-19 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2010-03-18 Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2010-02-11 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2010-02-11 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2010-02-10 House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2010-02-10 House/ 3rd reading in HCON
2010-02-01 House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in HSTRUL
2010-02-01 House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTREV
2010-02-01 House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTREV
2010-01-28 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2010-01-27 Senate/ to House in HCLERK
2010-01-27 Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2010-01-26 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2010-01-25 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2010-01-07 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SSEC
2009-12-23 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC
2009-12-14 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2009-12-10 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback