UT SB0025 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driver License and Identification Card Amendments
Title
Driver License and Identification Card Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB | |
2012-02-08 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2012-01-24 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTTPT | |
2012-01-23 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2012-01-23 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-23 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-19 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO | |
2012-01-19 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-12-19 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-12-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2011-10-20 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC | |
2011-10-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0025.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/sbillint/sb0025.pdf |