UT SB0025 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Share Certificates in Water Companies
Title
Share Certificates in Water Companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-14 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-14 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-02-11 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-11 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL | |
2011-02-09 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-09 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2011-02-07 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTNAE | |
2011-02-04 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2011-02-02 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2011-01-31 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-28 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-01-28 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-01-27 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-01-26 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTNAE | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-05 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2011-01-04 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2010-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2010-11-17 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |