UT SB0021 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Federal Land Application Advisory Committee Sunset Extension

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Land Application Advisory Committee Sunset Extension

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-01-19SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-14SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-12SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-12-21 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-16 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-16 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback