UT SB0021 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Unincorporated Business Entities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unincorporated Business Entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2013-03-25 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2013-03-25SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2013-03-21SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2013-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2013-03-08 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2013-03-07 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-07 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-07SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2013-03-07SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-07SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-07HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR
2013-03-07HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in HCON
2013-03-05HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in HCON
2013-03-05HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTBUS
2013-03-05HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTBUS
2013-03-05HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS
2013-03-01HouseHouse Comm - Held in HSTBUS
2013-02-27HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTBUS
2013-02-26HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-02-26HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2013-02-26HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2013-02-26HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2013-02-26SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in SCON
2013-02-21SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in SCON
2013-02-21SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in SSTBUS
2013-02-19SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTBUS
2013-02-19SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS
2013-02-19SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTBUS
2013-01-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS
2013-01-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-01-16SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2013-01-08 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC
2013-01-08 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC
2012-12-20 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2012-12-20 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2012-11-15 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2012-11-15 LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback