UT SB0021 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Social Worker Licensing
Title
Amendments to Social Worker Licensing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-17 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-17 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-02-16 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-02-12 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-02-11 | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL | |
2010-02-10 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-10 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-02-03 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTHHS | |
2010-02-03 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2010-01-28 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-27 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-01-27 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2010-01-26 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-01-25 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-01-21 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SINTRO | |
2009-12-17 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2009-12-17 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2009-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-19 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |