UT SB0020 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Management of Water Rights Amendments
Title
Management of Water Rights Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-16 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-02-07 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-03 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-02 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-02 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2011-02-01 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB | |
2011-01-31 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2011-01-27 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-26 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-01-26 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-01-25 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ Rules to calendar in S2ND | |
2011-01-20 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2011-01-03 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2010-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2010-11-17 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |