UT SB0019 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commercial Driver License Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Driver License Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment failed (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2013-03-21 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2013-03-21SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2013-03-21SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2013-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2013-02-18 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2013-02-14 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-02-14 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-02-14SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2013-02-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2013-02-13SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2013-02-13HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR
2013-02-13HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2013-02-07HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB
2013-02-07HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in HSTTRA
2013-02-06HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTTRA
2013-02-05HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTTRA
2013-02-01HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-02-01HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2013-01-31HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2013-01-31HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2013-01-31SenateSenate/ floor amendment failed in S3RD
2013-01-31SenateSenate/ floor amendment in S3RD
2013-01-31SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2013-01-30SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S3RD
2013-01-30SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2013-01-30SenateSenate/ uncircled in S2ND
2013-01-29SenateSenate/ circled in S2ND
2013-01-29SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2013-01-28SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in SSTRUL
2013-01-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-01-17SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SINTRO
2013-01-17SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO
2013-01-16SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2012-12-20 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2012-12-12 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2012-11-14 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2012-11-14 LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0019.htm
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillint/sb0019.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillamd/sb0019.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillenr/sb0019.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=55&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=95&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=96&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=105&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=106&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2013GS&voteid=2092&sequence=6288
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=258&house=H&sessionid=2013GS

Bill Comments

feedback